Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE GLASCOTE & STONYDELPH TEAM
Charity number: 1132564

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Temple | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marion Lincoln | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Joyce Thorpe | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sharron Gray | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Cooley | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Shaw | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Judge | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
REVD Gary Simmons | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Baker | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marie Richards | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Gill Judge | Trustee | 06 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
LEIGH DIANE BULL | Trustee |
|
||||||
THELMA ROSE LUKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV PAT FAULTLESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR DAVE FAULTLESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev MICHAEL RAYMOND LE-WORTHY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS. PAT WEST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.