WEDNESFIELD PAROCHIAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting in the religious education of young people. Also helping people in the parish with particular difficulties, where requested.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 24 June 1987: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Katharine Elizabeth Tingle | Chair | 23 June 2024 |
|
|||
DEREK JOHN BENNETT | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|||
Clive James Postle | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|||
MARGARET LILIAN CARROLL | Trustee |
|
||||
ROGER POOLE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.89k | £4.02k | £3.86k | £1.28k | £8.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.52k | £3.13k | £3.40k | £4.50k | £5.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 14 NOVEMBER 1986.
Charitable objects
(1) PAY A SUM OF ú25 OUT OF THE YEARLY INCOME OF THE CHARITY TO THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST THOMAS, WEDNESFIELD, FOR APPLICATION IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF ST THOMAS CHURCH, WEDNESFIELD; AND (2) APPLY THE RESIDUE OF THE INCOME FOR RELIEF IN NEED IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. THOMAS, WEDNESFIELD, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. THOMAS, WEDNESFIELD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 WHITTINGHAM GROVE
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV11 3RS
- Phone:
- 01902732092
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window