CARSHALTON METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1128616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £197.20k £248.84k £202.62k £235.65k £175.41k
Total expenditure £184.83k £247.28k £182.84k £194.21k £174.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A