CARSHALTON METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1128616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN KINGSNORTH Trustee 19 April 2015
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
SUSETTE ANN FORTY Trustee
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
KATY FRENKIEL Trustee None on record
STEPHEN HANLEY JORDAN Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
DEBORAH ANN JORDAN Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Geoffrey Paul Gunton Trustee 01 May 2014 None on record
MARGARET VALERIE AUSTEN Trustee 29 January 2020 None on record
CHARLOTTE REBECCA MELANIE RYAN Trustee None on record
Rev ROSEMARY JANE RICHTER BA/MPHIL Chair 01 September 2015
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
MICHAEL WEBB Trustee 01 May 2014 None on record
ANDREW STEPHEN DEARDS Trustee None on record
ELIZABETH ANNE GUNTON Trustee None on record
MICHAEL JAMES BOXALL Trustee None on record
CAROLINE JULIE COOK ACMA Trustee
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
CAROLINE ELSIE MARY KINGSNORTH Trustee 10 February 2013 None on record
ROSALIND SARAH BOXALL Trustee 19 April 2015 None on record
Fiona Potter Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
JACQUELINE MERIEL WAITE Trustee
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Sharon Johnson Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record