Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARD'S, LEXDEN
Charity number: 1128302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Matthew Jonathan SIMPKINS | Chair | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Anne Firth | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Firth | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Allston | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Allston | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Yvonne Cleverdon | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Frances Hinchcliffe | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Marguerite Watkins | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David John Burrows | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Margaret Frances Telford Whiteman | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE GAIL ROMAIN | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ALAN WATKINS | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev VIVIEN EVELYN MENDHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Adrian Steward | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH ANNE STEELE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE VIOLET MESSINGER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.