ST JOHNS METHODIST CHURCH BLOXWICH

Charity number: 1128201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 04 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 January 2018 209 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 February 2018 227 days late Download