ST JOHNS METHODIST CHURCH BLOXWICH

Charity number: 1128201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £85.63k £108.86k £85.81k £119.25k £90.72k
Total expenditure £129.03k £106.98k £95.50k £93.40k £123.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A