ST JOHNS METHODIST CHURCH BLOXWICH

Charity number: 1128201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

26 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Mavis Bond Trustee 21 May 2019 None on record
PAUL BOWDLER WILDE Trustee
THE BROWNHILLS AND WILLENHALL METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Carl John Bolton Trustee 07 September 2017
BLOXWICH AND BLAKENALL FOODBANK Recently registered
THE BROWNHILLS AND WILLENHALL METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Keith Walton Trustee
WOLVERHAMPTON AND SHREWSBURY METHODIST DISTRICT Received: On time
THE BROWNHILLS AND WILLENHALL METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
YVONNE GOUGH Trustee
THE BROWNHILLS AND WILLENHALL METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Norma Rae Sedgwick Trustee 21 May 2019 None on record
Brenda Wilson Trustee 21 May 2019 None on record
HELEN BARBARA COX Trustee
THE BROWNHILLS AND WILLENHALL METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
JOYCE MARY SMITH Trustee None on record
CHRISTINE FLETCHER Trustee None on record
Vivian Sandra Wilde Trustee 07 September 2017 None on record
PETER MICHAEL BOX Trustee
BLOXWICH AND BLAKENALL FOODBANK Recently registered
DORIS WHITEHOUSE Trustee None on record
John Michael Hill Trustee 21 May 2019 None on record
Diana Louise Bolton Trustee 06 May 2018
BLOXWICH AND BLAKENALL FOODBANK Recently registered
STEVEN BUTLER Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
DAVID BROWN Trustee None on record
FREDERICK JAMES SMITH Trustee 03 March 2013 None on record
MOIRA KATHLEEN SIMPSON Trustee
THE BROWNHILLS AND WILLENHALL METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Janet Ruth Bramwell Trustee 01 May 2010 None on record
JACKIE WHITEHOUSE Trustee
THE BROWNHILLS AND WILLENHALL METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Freda Woodward Trustee 06 May 2018 None on record
ROGER HENRY WOODWARD Trustee 01 September 2014
THE BROWNHILLS AND WILLENHALL METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
ANGELA NEWEY Trustee
THE BROWNHILLS AND WILLENHALL METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
ROSEMARY STATHAM Trustee 05 March 2013 None on record
Rev Jeremy Robert Hawkins Chair 01 September 2018
THE BROWNHILLS AND WILLENHALL METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time