ST ANDREW'S METHODIST CHURCH WORCESTER

Charity number: 1128272
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS PAT LANDER Trustee None on record
DR Carolyn Moody Trustee 26 September 2016 None on record
Jason Neil Moseley Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
VANESSA JULIE FEWTRELL Trustee None on record
Pamela Christine Hawkeswood Trustee 20 July 2021 None on record
DAVID BOWER Trustee None on record
CHRISTINE JOAN PARKER CERT ED Trustee
South Worcestershire Methodist Circuit Received: On time
Lesley Vine Trustee 07 September 2016 None on record
Alan Carr Fewtrell Trustee 23 September 2016 None on record
MICHAEL ARTHUR VINE Trustee
South Worcestershire Methodist Circuit Received: On time
RICHARD FOOT Trustee 23 September 2016
South Worcestershire Methodist Circuit Received: On time
Maurice Walter Hubbard Trustee 23 September 2016 None on record
MARGARET COLES Trustee 07 September 2016 None on record
Rev HELEN MARY CAINE Chair 01 September 2014
DROITWICH METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
EVESHAM METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
THE WORCESTERSHIRE AND DUDLEY HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST Received: On time
South Worcestershire Methodist Circuit Received: On time
PAULINE THORPE Trustee
HOME-START SOUTH WORCESTERSHIRE