Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BRAMLEY, GUILDFORD
Charity number: 1128620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Monica Ines Snelling | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hassell | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Oldrey | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Mintz | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan O'Connell | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Williams | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jill Mussett | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Gates | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.