Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN-AT-HAMPSTEAD

Charity number: 1129264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £854.52k £659.40k £457.64k £513.03k £386.53k
Total expenditure £342.50k £564.93k £519.71k £470.55k £387.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £300 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £752.78k £554.82k N/A £435.07k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £49.04k N/A £22.98k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £39.66k £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £1.00k £751 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £63.08k £56.29k N/A £54.98k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £454.94k £221.45k N/A £101.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £312.40k £524.61k N/A £451.09k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £30.10k £40.32k N/A £19.46k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £1.20k £1.20k N/A £2.25k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £26.80k £31.90k N/A £63.57k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A