CALDERDALE WELLBEING

Charity number: 1132316
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 06 December 2016 On time Download