THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST DERBY, ST MARY

Charity number: 1128143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Stephen Boyd Chair 06 November 2016 None on record
GILLIAN ELIZABETH JONES Trustee
FRIENDS OF CROXTETH HALL AND COUNTRY PARK Received: On time
KERRY STEWART Trustee None on record
Pat Goodman Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
BARBARA CAIN Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
David Alan Hale Trustee None on record
BARBARA MOORE Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
MR REG GOODMAN Trustee None on record
PAT GORNALL Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
Brian Yates Trustee None on record
ANDREW DAWES Trustee 25 October 2020 None on record
CHERYL WEBSTER Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
STEPHANIE ELLISON Trustee 24 April 2016
WEST DERBY WAR MEMORIAL Overdue by 1817 days
ADAM PRICE Trustee 25 October 2020 None on record
DIANE VICTORIA THOMAS Trustee
THE ST. MARYS MILLENNIUM CENTRE LIVERPOOL LIMITED Received: On time
RICHARD ANTHONY RUSSEL JONES Trustee None on record
ROSIE CRITCHLEY Trustee 01 January 2013 None on record
Jane Wheeler Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
KATHRYN YATES Trustee None on record
KATHY BEGLEY Trustee 01 January 2013 None on record