GREEN ACADEMY TRUST

Charity number: 1129270
Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 282 days
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 282 days
Annual return 22 April 2019 22 June 2020 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2019 22 June 2020 121 days late Download
Annual return 22 April 2018 22 June 2020 486 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2018 22 June 2020 486 days late Download
Annual return 22 April 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2017 18 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 22 April 2016 19 May 2017 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2016 19 May 2017 86 days late Download