Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT CHESHAM

Charity number: 1129438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.16m £965.08k £942.70k £815.25k £906.53k
Total expenditure £834.39k £956.46k £874.47k £904.70k £866.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £14.53k £758
Income - Donations and legacies £900.08k £885.60k £884.68k £772.17k £871.38k
Income - Other trading activities £30.79k £33.53k £41.10k £18.79k £24.71k
Income - Charitable activities £29.14k £39.98k £7.86k £3.44k £3.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.56k £5.97k £7.00k £5.83k £5.87k
Income - Other £195.04k £0 £2.07k £15.03k £758
Income - Legacies £12.86k £11.00k £26.19k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £833.00k £955.31k £874.19k £904.70k £866.38k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.39k £1.14k £281 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.92k £4.10k £3.33k £2.43k £2.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £114.29k £0 £121.18k £132.44k £111.20k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0