Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT CHESHAM

Charity number: 1129438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

41 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Canon Edward Bowes-Smith Chair 14 September 2020
None on record
Bernard Patterson Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Lynelle Bishop Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
James Turner Trustee 15 May 2024
WYCLIFFE UK LIMITED
Received: On time
Julie Rennard Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Don Sanderson Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Devaneson Robert Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Martin Phillips Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Dr Matthew White Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
Henry Devereux Trustee 18 January 2023
None on record
Rev Edward Lees-Millais Trustee 05 September 2022
CHELSEA GOSPEL TRUST
Recently registered
John Spence Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
Richard Hartfall Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Sarah Williams Trustee 27 April 2022
FOUNTAIN OF PEACE CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION UK
Received: On time
Sarah Tasker Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Rev Darren Dalton Trustee 03 March 2022
None on record
Rev David Hyndman Trustee 05 January 2022
None on record
Rev Phil Nightingale Trustee 06 September 2021
None on record
Rev Jeremy Michael Moodey Trustee 03 July 2021
THE CARFAX TRUST
Received: On time
TRINITY COLLEGE BRISTOL LIMITED
Received: On time
Malcolm Philip Bonner Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
Chris Clarke Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
Peter Hamilton Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
GEOFFREY ALAN HOUSTON Trustee 21 October 2020
THE HOUSTON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 7 days late
Rachel Meldrum MAOxon PhD Trustee 15 January 2020
None on record
Ruth Brown Trustee 18 September 2019
None on record
David Green Trustee 15 May 2019
WAKEBANKES TRUST
Received: On time
Jacqueline Rose Trustee 30 April 2019
None on record
Andrew Robert Patterson Trustee 25 April 2018
Project Possible
Received: On time
Marjorie Ann Davies B Mus AICC Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
Ian Hamilton Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
LISBETH CAMERON Trustee 20 September 2012
None on record
JACQUIE HARDMAN Trustee 20 September 2012
THE MIJODA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MICHAEL RICHARD HARDMAN Trustee 19 September 2012
THE DAWES HOMES
Received: On time
STEPHENSON CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE MIJODA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE OCCOLD TRUST
Overdue by 135 days
JOHN MAYNE Trustee 03 June 2011
ASHLEY GREEN AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Julie Patricia Dziegiel Trustee
AMERSHAM DEANERY TRUST
Received: On time
THE OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
PARISH GIVING SCHEME
Received: On time
OPEN SYNOD GROUP
Received: On time
Christopher Embleton-Smith Trustee
Equipping Pastors Worldwide Ltd
Received: On time
THE CHESHAM ECUMENICAL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
SIMON TIMOTHY EVANS FCA DCHA Trustee
NOVI MOST INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
DR TIM YATES Trustee
THE CHESS VALLEY ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
GRAHAM GEORGE GREEN Trustee
None on record
HILARY JOAN POVEY Trustee
None on record
MARGARET ANN GINGELL Trustee
None on record