THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS LIGHTWATER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Responsible for the smooth running of Church affairs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS PCC, LIGHTWATER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glenys Lewis | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Williams | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Davis | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Coltman | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Hockey | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Imran Daniel | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Taylor | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Hodgeson | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Charlotte Finlay | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN HAWKINS | Trustee | 17 May 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.28k | £136.43k | £131.65k | £146.67k | £168.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.08k | £125.92k | £135.22k | £159.42k | £160.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 November 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 November 2020 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church Hall
Broadway Road
LIGHTWATER
Surrey
GU18 5SJ
- Phone:
- 01276453121
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window