Accounts and annual returns SYDENHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1129401
Charity reporting is overdue by 1577 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 481 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 481 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 847 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 847 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1212 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1212 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1577 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1577 days