THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, BLETCHLEY

Charity number: 1128447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £439.60k £441.98k £342.53k £397.77k £393.80k
Total expenditure £438.59k £406.48k £384.73k £410.12k £373.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £4.75k £6.91k