Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CRONDALL & EWSHOT

Charity number: 1128489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £121.26k £119.57k £137.47k £148.06k £163.40k
Total expenditure £138.10k £127.59k £115.60k £134.73k £158.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.17k £721 N/A