Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LONG DITTON
Charity number: 1128898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Kuhan Satkunanayagam | Chair | 12 August 2015 |
|
|||||
DIANA JEMMETT | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE SMITH | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Carvalho | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Spence | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Kathryn Leeson | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev ALISON MARY BAVERSTOCK | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|||||
ROBERT WILLIAM HANCOCK | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JOY LE ROUX | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JOHN RENNIE | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE HALL | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN RIDER | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER HOWARD | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PENNY FUSSELL | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.