Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN'S WOODBRIDGE

Charity number: 1128699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 July 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window