Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN'S WOODBRIDGE

Charity number: 1128699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £283.79k £306.15k £252.12k £222.92k £238.89k
Total expenditure £279.48k £270.23k £250.86k £213.29k £260.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A