Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN'S WOODBRIDGE

Charity number: 1128699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Charles Trefusis Chair 21 June 2022
None on record
Julia Petronella Lincoln Bsc Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Michael David Anthony Keen Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Avril Jayne Askew Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
DIANNE MARGARET RUSS Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Carol Saunders Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Dr Fiona Mary Watson Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Peter John Plummer Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Richard Michael Bolt Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Noelle Helen Gore Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Luc Herve Ray-Mathur Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Alan Edward Thomas Nunn Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Rosemary Pamela Evans Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
WILLIAM FRANK HERBERT Trustee
None on record
MARILYN MARGARET SPALL Trustee
None on record
GAYNOR MARY NICHOLS Trustee
None on record
Alan John Hawes Trustee
FELIX THORNLEY COBBOLD AGRICULTURAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE SUFFOLK HORSE SOCIETY
Received: On time
ANTHONY ROBERT ALLWOOD Trustee
ST EDMUNDSBURY AND IPSWICH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE QUEEN VICTORIA CLERGY FUND
Received: On time