THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW, TRIANGLE AND ALL SAINTS

Charity number: 1129487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £359.81k £320.58k £252.58k £607.98k £386.98k
Total expenditure £282.98k £304.80k £283.93k £262.72k £295.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £966 £150
Income from government grants £3.98k £10.51k £4.42k £1.15k £10.28k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £564.54k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £8.40k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £31.22k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £71 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £3.76k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £346.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £261.35k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £1.36k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £70 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A