THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW, TRIANGLE AND ALL SAINTS

Charity number: 1129487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANE MARIAN CORNISH Trustee 01 August 2013 None on record
Rev DANIEL MORRISON Trustee 22 October 2012 None on record
MARK ARNOLD CORNISH Trustee None on record
Rev RUTH HELEN BEST Trustee None on record
REV NICK ATKINS Chair
DAUNDY TRUST Received: On time
Claire Louise Ruddock Trustee 29 October 2020 None on record
Rev Linda Pepper Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record
Rev Andrew Kevin Buttress Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
Lynn Marie Turner Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record
Helen Jane Clarke Trustee 29 October 2020
1ST BRAMFORD SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
Jackie Pickering Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Dr ANDREW PAUL REVITT Trustee 14 September 2011 None on record
Bennet Christian Hawley Formesyn Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record
Dr Valerie Rickett Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
MRS VERA EVRIPIDOU Trustee None on record
Obiageri Cleopatra Simon-Hart Trustee 04 February 2020 None on record
Elizabeth Anne Hook Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
LAWRENCE ALAN CAREY Trustee None on record
Henry Nathaniel Catchpole Trustee 29 October 2020 None on record
Karen Linda Nelson Trustee 22 April 2014
TRIANGLE LIVING WATER LIMITED
Lorna Anne Penaluna Trustee 29 October 2020 None on record