Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, BISHOP'S WALTHAM
Charity number: 1128411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JAMES CASTLE HUNT | Chair |
|
||||||
Amanda Joy Cawood | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Mary Russell | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Hawkins | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Weir | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Pratt | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER HORNER | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE CRADDOCK | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH WEBB | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE PALMER | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Wollam | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Emmerson | Trustee | 23 May 2013 |
|
|||||
Nigel Barnfield | Trustee | 12 March 2004 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.