SWINDON EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1129912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Public services of worship, prayer & Bible study meetings, Sunday school, children's & teenagers' clubs, parent & toddler group, men's & women's groups, outreach to the homeless, outreach to the elderly & support for missions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £271,768
Total expenditure: £238,048

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Swindon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD FOSTER Chair
None on record
Thomas Brewer Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Paula Joy James Trustee 01 January 2022
THE SAREPTA TRUST
Received: On time
Brian Whittaker Trustee 23 February 2021
SOUTH WEST GOSPEL PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Michel Crabol Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Barney Main Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Colin Bentley Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Luke Moody Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
JONATHAN REDHEAD Trustee
None on record
MARK TRAFFORD Trustee
None on record
JOHN BAKER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £366.70k £461.62k £305.74k £577.29k £271.77k
Total expenditure £148.25k £189.18k £249.22k £276.19k £238.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £564.55k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £12.74k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £276.19k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £2.11k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 26 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 26 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17-19 DEVIZES ROAD
SWINDON
SN1 4BH
Phone:
01793541153