Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THAMES DITTON

Charity number: 1128454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £155.61k £212.16k £175.51k £121.76k £187.95k
Total expenditure £153.11k £231.97k £178.59k £157.43k £204.86k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £2.61k N/A