THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW, HIGHFIELD

Charity number: 1129464
Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £336.89k £363.65k £357.33k £336.51k £349.10k
Total expenditure £379.10k £370.62k £346.34k £363.13k £337.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A