Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAWRENCE, LITTLE STANMORE ALIAS WHITCHURCH
Charity number: 1130629
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leslie Hammond | Trustee | 09 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Anne Johnson | Trustee | 09 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Maureen Sayer | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Mary Marney | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ERNEST SAILOR | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ANNE HUNTLEY | Trustee | 15 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Paul Christopher John HUNTLEY | Trustee | 15 July 2012 |
|
|||||
SARA-JANE DONOVAN | Trustee | 05 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Tudor Davies | Trustee | 01 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
REV PAUL M REECE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERIC DAVID RAMSAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.