THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HIGH WYCOMBE ST ANDREW

Charity number: 1128971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 10 October 2017 On time Download