THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HIGH WYCOMBE ST ANDREW

Charity number: 1128971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £356.02k £411.10k £468.65k £702.55k £430.48k
Total expenditure £360.82k £364.26k £448.70k £416.33k £390.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.00k N/A £5.00k £29.16k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £644.97k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £28.86k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £1.80k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £297 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £26.62k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £416.33k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £2.85k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £43.03k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A