Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN THAME

Charity number: 1129373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Fearon Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Sue Lay Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Natasha Challoner Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Sharon Bond Trustee 20 April 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BARLEY HILL
Received: On time
Rev Michael Reading Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Vicki Reay Trustee 16 April 2019
None on record
David Brown Trustee 15 April 2019
None on record
Margaret Jewson Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
David John Gurney Trustee 01 May 2017
None on record
Linda Ferris Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
Robert Ridgway Trustee 01 April 2013
None on record
HELENA FICKLING Trustee
THAME CHARITIES
Received: 51 days late
ROSALIE ANNE GIBSON Trustee
THAME CHARITIES
Received: 51 days late