NORTHWOOD OFFICERS' MESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Northwood Officers Mess Fund is a dispersing fund, the primary objective of which is to make minimal profit whilst striving to meet the needs of the beneficiaries of the fund as efficiently and economically as possible. The fund confines itself to the activities and expenditure for the purpose for which it was instituted and that the law, as laid down in the Trustee Investments Act 1961.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 28 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil A Towers | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £259.71k | £53.41k | £179.81k | £294.61k | £292.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £247.86k | £65.37k | £155.31k | £294.09k | £273.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 04 MAR 2009
Charitable objects
The charity's object (the object) is 'the promotion of efficiency of the armed forces of the Crown by the provision and support of facilities and activities for the efficiency and well-being of service personnel'.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northwood Headquarters
J S U Mail Office
Sandy Lane
Northwood
HA6 3HP
- Phone:
- 01923957071
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window