Trustees WEST WORTHING BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1128701

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Luciana Monteverde Damascena | Chair | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adegboyega Ogunwale | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Catherine Pimenta | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Margaret White | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Fitzalan-Hawkes | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Leslie Peirce King | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian John Mann | Trustee | 22 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANNE CLARK | Trustee | 24 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR R SAVILLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS J VALENTINE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.