COMMUNITY LAW SERVICE(NORTHAMPTON AND COUNTY)

Charity number: 1128718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 08 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 December 2016 On time Download