Accounts and annual returns DATCHET ST MARY'S C OF E SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1130135
Charity reporting is overdue by 4 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 4 days
Accounts and TAR 11 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 4 days
Annual return 11 June 2022 30 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 11 June 2021 19 June 2023 434 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 11 June 2020 30 March 2023 718 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 11 June 2019 30 March 2023 1083 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 June 2019 Not Required