Financial history DATCHET ST MARY'S C OF E SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1130135
Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/06/2018 11/06/2019 11/06/2020 11/06/2021 11/06/2022
Total gross income £6.15k £4.84k £3.43k £0 £2
Total expenditure £6.58k £5.11k £3.12k £0 £1.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A