Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL HALLOWS BY THE TOWER WITH ST. DUNSTAN'S IN THE EAST, LONDON

Charity number: 1129137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £397.64k £389.85k £442.32k £497.75k £339.38k
Total expenditure £346.75k £340.99k £451.00k £410.77k £326.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £11.03k