Trustees RASPBERRY PI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr John Lazar Chair 10 August 2020
None on record
Charles Richard Leadbeater Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record
Amali Chivanthi de Alwis Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record
Daniel Labbad Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record
Prof Richard Plumbly-Clegg Trustee 19 September 2019
None on record
KIM SHILLINGLAW Trustee 19 September 2019
None on record
Jonathan Ilan Drori Trustee 01 November 2017
THE HAROLD HYAM WINGATE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CAMBRIDGE SCIENCE CENTRE
Received: 3 days late
THE EDEN TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Matilda Phoebe Blyth Trustee 29 November 2016
None on record