THE D-DAY REVISITED SOCIETY

Charity number: 1129753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £413.46k £1.21m £21.60k £538.18k £327.47k
Total expenditure £214.68k £359.72k £421.91k £298.32k £946.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £400.00k £1.12m £0 £500.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £86.84k N/A £530.42k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £1.12m N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £7.63k N/A £7.76k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £530.42k N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £350.54k N/A £292.22k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £9.17k N/A £6.10k N/A