SUTTON COLDFIELD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Church providing youth and community services in and around Sutton Coldfield
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 24 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 06 April 2016: Funds received from 1113091 FOUNDATIONS WEST MIDLANDS
- SCBC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judy Hyde | Chair | 23 November 2017 |
|
|||||
David Gordon | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Louise Gore | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Mark Steel | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Mark Timothy Maybury | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
DONALD CAMPBELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £739.36k | £819.38k | £833.88k | £936.74k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £748.56k | £811.79k | £870.64k | £899.25k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £80.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £707.42k | £771.49k | £806.42k | £785.06k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.27k | £838 | £916 | £1.17k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £28.94k | £46.64k | £25.17k | £147.20k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £736 | £418 | £1.37k | £3.31k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £50.00k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £748.56k | £811.79k | £870.64k | £899.25k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUTTON COLDFIELD BAPTIST CHURCH
TRINITY HILL
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B72 1TA
- Phone:
- 01213555088
- Email:
- office@scbc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window