THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, OXFORD

Charity number: 1129280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £864.77k £890.49k £741.72k £727.40k £745.64k
Total expenditure £614.86k £616.56k £655.20k £671.45k £663.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £12.38k
Income - Donations and legacies £831.29k £847.89k £691.38k £689.35k £703.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £22.12k £26.07k £36.71k £27.62k £24.03k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £295 £122 £88 £118 £107
Income - Other £11.06k £16.42k £13.54k £10.32k £18.51k
Income - Legacies £4.00k £0 £8.09k £1.00k £137
Expenditure - Charitable activities £614.29k £614.44k £654.82k £671.45k £663.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds £564 £2.12k £381 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.78k £3.04k £3.66k £3.34k £3.42k
Expenditure - Grants institution £65.56k £40.18k £67.44k £77.16k £56.76k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0