Accounts and annual returns HEREFORD MUSIC SCHOOL &STUDIOS

Charity number: 1130209
Charity reporting is overdue by 582 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 217 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 217 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 582 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 582 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 November 2020 383 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required