Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, IVER
Charity number: 1128999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Robert Gooding | Chair | 16 October 2013 |
|
|||||
Paul Martin Fisher | Trustee | 18 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sarah Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 03 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Bristol | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jan Rayner | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Reina Fisher-van Werkhoven | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amit John | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
ANGELA MARGARET LINDSTROM | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Norcliffe Ernest Rawlings | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
TINA LOUISE LEWIS | Trustee | 25 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANITRA MAY CUFF | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL ANITA NIKOLAY | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
GERALD MALCOLM PAINE | Trustee |
|
||||||
JAMES STANLEY DASHPER LLM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.