Trustees EBETRUST
Charity number: 1129106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Michael Wall | Chair | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lee Robert Haynes | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Fisher | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annette Lorraine Jones | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Douglas North | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew Peter Smith | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Brooks | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Powell | Trustee | 06 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEREK JAMES POWELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
Adrian Hamilton Reed | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HENRY PAYTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW PHILIP TETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.