THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, BIDEFORD

Charity number: 1129064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £212.50k £276.02k £180.08k £173.04k £139.99k
Total expenditure £223.32k £198.44k £217.28k £154.03k £142.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A