THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, BIDEFORD

Charity number: 1129064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BENJAMIN JAMES DUHIG Trustee 23 March 2014 None on record
RICHARD CHARLES HOLWILL Trustee None on record
MARGARET CHRISTINA MURRAY Trustee 28 October 2011 None on record
John Emms Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Rev Christopher John Hutchins Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
David Maurice Bertie Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Rev Stephen Robin Pirrie Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
PATRICIA ANNE MORRIS Trustee 17 April 2016 None on record
Pamela Margaret Howlett Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
LORNA MARY RUTH DORRINTON Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Nadine Frances Pearce Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Christopher Beechey Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Rosaleen Ann Day Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
RICHARD JOHN LOUIS JAMES Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Rev CLAIRE PAMELA ROSE-CASEMORE Chair 28 October 2011 None on record
STEPHEN JOHN ROBERTS Trustee 24 April 2016
NORTHERN DEVON FOODBANK Received: On time
ELEANOR MILDRED EDWINA REDFEARN DOE Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record