Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KINGSTHORPE
Charity number: 1130370

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV JANE BUTLER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shirley Basford | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jean Hunt | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Mary Hardwick | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Margaret Stevens | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Griffin | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richie David Carrick | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sarah Louise Lee | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jonathan Lee | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula Blackwell | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Joy Hickman | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Jo Carrick | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Lesley Gould BA Hons | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN WILCOX | Trustee | 12 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JUNE ADRIENNE WARD | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARK JEREMY BRAME | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS BECKY ADNITT | Trustee | 11 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELIZABETH SERBYN BED Hons | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR CHRIS WOODLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAUREEN ANN ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER DAVID BORLEY-COX BAHonsFCMA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MANDY BENTLEY RN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH-JANE MAJOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SUE EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE ANN STONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH GRACE MAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.